Curriculum Resources
Take learning to the next level and transform the way you teach with a vast library of ready-to-use, standards-aligned, adaptable curriculum resources. The resources listed below are either available with an Online Learning Subscription which allows you to instruct, assess and track student performance or as individual hands-on classroom resources which can be purchased. Choose from Multimedia Lessons, Curriculum Mastery Games, Flip Charts, Visual Learning Guides, Flash Cards, Vocabulary Cards, and Curriculum Modules available on our online store. PREMIUM ONLINE LEARNING SUBSCRIPTION OPTIONS
  • Select By Standard
  • BROWSE CURRICULUM
    • General Science
    • Life Science / Biology
    • Human Body
    • Earth Science
    • Physical Science
    • Chemistry
    • Math
    • Language Arts
    • Social Studies
 

Multiplication

Mathematics, Grade 5

Back
 

Study Guide

Provides a quick overview of the topic selected!

Flash Cards

Practice and review the topic selected with illustrated flash cards!

Quiz

Assess students’ understanding of the topic selected!

Worksheets

Print illustrated worksheets!

Games

Engage students with interactive games.

Study Guide Multiplication Mathematics, Grade 5

1
/
3
THREE DIGIT MULTIPLICATION Multiplying three-digit numbers by one digit numbers: 245 x 3 = ? Step #1: Place one number above the other so that the ones' place digits are lined up. Draw a line under the bottom number. 245 x 3 Step #2: Multiply the two numbers in the ones' place (3 x 5 = 15). This answer is larger than 9,so place the 1 above the tens' place column and place the 5 below the line in the ones' place column. 1 245 x 3 5 Step #3: Next, multiply 3 and the number in the tens' place column (4). 3 x 4 = 12. Add the 1 you carried to the tens column to the 12 (12 + 1 = 13). Place the 1 above the hundreds’ place column and place the 3 below the line in the tens’ place column. 1 + 1 245 x 3 35 Step #4 (Final Step): Now, multiply the 3 and the number in the hundred' place column (2). 3 x 2 = 6. Add the 1 you carried to the hundreds column to the 6 (6 + 1 = 7) and place the answer below the line in the hundreds place column. + 1 1 245 x 3 735 © Copyright NewPath Learning. All Rights Reserved. Permission is granted for the purchaser to print copies for non-commercial educational purposes only. Visit us at www.NewPathLearning.com.
Multiplying three-digit numbers by two digit numbers: 245 x 13 = ? In order to multiply these two numbers you would first follow the 4 steps listed above: Step #1 245 x 13 Step #2 1 245 x 13 5 Step #3 1 + 1 245 x 13 35 Step #4 + 1 1 245 x 13 735 Now there are a few more steps to complete in order to get the answer: Step #5 245 Multiply the 1 in the tens place of the number 13 by the x 13 number 5 in 245. 1 x 5 = 5. Place the 5 under the 3 735 (under the line in the tens column) 5 Step #6 245 Multiply the 1 in the tens place of the number 13 by the x 13 number 4 in 245. 1 x 4 = 4. Place the 4 under the 7 (under the line in the hundreds column) 735 45 © Copyright NewPath Learning. All Rights Reserved. Permission is granted for the purchaser to print copies for non-commercial educational purposes only. Visit us at www.NewPathLearning.com.
Step #7 245 Multiply the 1 in the tens place of the number 13 by the x 13 number 2 in 245. 1 x 2 = 2. (Place the 2 under the line 735 in the thousands column) 245 Step #8 245 x 13 735 Add 735 and 245 together the way they are lined up. 245 3,185 245 x 13 = 3,185 © Copyright NewPath Learning. All Rights Reserved. Permission is granted for the purchaser to print copies for non-commercial educational purposes only. Visit us at www.NewPathLearning.com.
© Copyright 2012-2018 NewPath Learning. All Rights Reserved. Privacy Notice * Terms of Use